User contributions
From NovaRoma
(Latest | Earliest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)
- 15:21, 12 December 2015 (diff | hist) N File:Proto-Final-PrincepsSenatus-logo.png (top)
- 10:33, 12 December 2015 (diff | hist) m Dictator (Nova Roma) (Added line break)
- 10:13, 12 December 2015 (diff | hist) m Fasti consulares (Nova Roma) (Updated stats)
- 10:02, 12 December 2015 (diff | hist) Template:2015 (Noted Laenas's 2nd consulship)
- 09:55, 12 December 2015 (diff | hist) m Fasti consulares (Nova Roma) (added missing consuls)
- 09:35, 12 December 2015 (diff | hist) m Template:Current consules (Added Laenas)
- 08:15, 12 December 2015 (diff | hist) File:CIV-Marcus Pompeius Caninus.jpg (uploaded a new version of "File:CIV-Marcus Pompeius Caninus.jpg": Category:Citizen photos)
- 08:00, 12 December 2015 (diff | hist) m Fasti censorii (Nova Roma) (Added missing years)
- 16:14, 9 December 2015 (diff | hist) N File:CIV-Publius Cornelius Cethegus.jpg (Category:Citizen photos) (top)
- 08:16, 8 December 2015 (diff | hist) m Gnaeus Iulius Caesar (Nova Roma) (Added office held details)
- 06:39, 8 December 2015 (diff | hist) Gnaeus Iulius Caesar (Nova Roma)
- 06:38, 8 December 2015 (diff | hist) N File:CnICeagle2.png (top)
- 23:34, 7 December 2015 (diff | hist) Publius Cornelius Cethegus (Nova Roma) (top)
- 23:32, 7 December 2015 (diff | hist) m Publius Cornelius Cethegus (Nova Roma) (Altered album name)
- 09:57, 7 December 2015 (diff | hist) N Approved Budget 2015 (Created page with " ===Budget 2015=== Webhosting: $200.00 Go Daddy Registerred Agent: $250.00 Ainsworth Annual Report: $40.00 State of Maine QuickBooks: $550.00 Quickbooks ...")
- 06:49, 5 December 2015 (diff | hist) m Senate Policy Committee (Nova Roma) (Added Laenas)
- 21:05, 4 December 2015 (diff | hist) N Quintus Servilius Priscus (Nova Roma) (moved Quintus Servilius Priscus (Nova Roma) to Publius Cornelius Cethegus (Nova Roma): Citizen reverted his gens and status) (top)
- 21:05, 4 December 2015 (diff | hist) m Publius Cornelius Cethegus (Nova Roma) (moved Quintus Servilius Priscus (Nova Roma) to Publius Cornelius Cethegus (Nova Roma): Citizen reverted his gens and status)
- 21:19, 3 December 2015 (diff | hist) m MMDCCLXVIII (Tidied up link to governors) (top)
- 13:26, 3 December 2015 (diff | hist) m MMDCCLXVIII (removed duplicated list of governors and inserted link to provincia page)
- 06:27, 3 December 2015 (diff | hist) m Provincia (Nova Roma) (Removed Crassus and Quadratus)
- 07:49, 30 November 2015 (diff | hist) m Gnaeus Iulius Caesar (Nova Roma) (Protected "Gnaeus Iulius Caesar (Nova Roma)": Prevent tampering ([edit=sysop] (indefinite) [move=sysop] (indefinite)))
- 06:32, 30 November 2015 (diff | hist) Template:Current Events Shortlist (Update re the dictatorship)
- 13:48, 29 November 2015 (diff | hist) m Provincia (Nova Roma) (Removed Tutor from sub list of Sarmatia)
- 23:42, 28 November 2015 (diff | hist) m Provincia (Nova Roma) (Spacing edit on Pannonia)
- 23:40, 28 November 2015 (diff | hist) File:Europewikimap.png (uploaded a new version of "File:Europewikimap.png": Included Provincia Marcomannia and deleted Provincia Venedia)
- 23:11, 28 November 2015 (diff | hist) m Provincia (Nova Roma) (Removal of Tutor as governor of Sarmatia)
- 23:09, 28 November 2015 (diff | hist) Provincia (Nova Roma) (Changes to list to accomodate addition of Provincia Marcomannia and deletion of Provincia Venedia)
- 15:18, 24 November 2015 (diff | hist) m Magistrates MMDCCLXVIII
- 15:17, 24 November 2015 (diff | hist) m Magistrates MMDCCLXVIII (Phrase change to Ed. Comm. position)
- 00:32, 21 November 2015 (diff | hist) Magistrates MMDCCLXVIII
- 00:29, 21 November 2015 (diff | hist) Magistrates MMDCCLXVIII
- 00:28, 21 November 2015 (diff | hist) m Magistrates MMDCCLXVIII
- 00:24, 21 November 2015 (diff | hist) m Magistrates MMDCCLXVIII (Tidied up removal notations. Rmvd. names)
- 22:03, 20 November 2015 (diff | hist) Magistrates MMDCCLXVIII
- 22:02, 20 November 2015 (diff | hist) Magistrates MMDCCLXVIII
- 22:01, 20 November 2015 (diff | hist) Magistrates MMDCCLXVIII
- 21:46, 20 November 2015 (diff | hist) Magistrates MMDCCLXVIII
- 21:42, 20 November 2015 (diff | hist) Magistrates MMDCCLXVIII (→Corporate Officer)
- 21:36, 20 November 2015 (diff | hist) MMDCCLXVIII
- 21:34, 20 November 2015 (diff | hist) Curator aerarii (Nova Roma)
- 21:32, 20 November 2015 (diff | hist) m CFO (Redirected page to Chief Financial Officer (CFO) (Nova Roma))
- 21:28, 20 November 2015 (diff | hist) Magistrates MMDCCLXVIII (Included CFO position)
- 05:14, 20 November 2015 (diff | hist) m Senate Public Enterprise Committee (Nova Roma) (Removed the resigned and removed)
- 05:14, 20 November 2015 (diff | hist) m Senate Policy Committee (Nova Roma) (removed the resigned and removed)
- 05:13, 20 November 2015 (diff | hist) m Senate Finance Committee (Nova Roma) (Removed those who resigned)
- 05:12, 20 November 2015 (diff | hist) m Senate Communications Committee (Nova Roma) (Removed those resigned or removed)
- 05:12, 20 November 2015 (diff | hist) m Senate Civic Education Committee (Nova Roma) (Removed Dexter and Scholastica)
- 03:38, 20 November 2015 (diff | hist) m List of ius sententiae dicendae (Removed Laenas)
- 03:36, 20 November 2015 (diff | hist) m List of current senators (Added laenas & reordered & updated positions held)
(Latest | Earliest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)