Search results
From NovaRoma
- * [[Marcus Iulius Severus (Nova Roma)|Marcus Iulius Severus]], Praetor * [[Titus Flavius Aquila (Nova Roma)|Titus Flavius Aquila]], Tribunus Plebis Novae Romae9 KB (1,483 words) - 22:02, 15 September 2021
- Final update: [[User:Titus Iulius Sabinus|Titus Iulius Sabinus]] 01:22, 16 October 2011 (CEST) ...e="text-align:center; font-size:8pt;" | [[Titus Iulius Sabinus (Nova Roma)|Titus Iulius Sabinus (TIS)]], [[Lucia Iulia Aquila (Nova Roma)|Lucia Iulia Aquila37 KB (4,603 words) - 23:42, 15 October 2011
- *[[Titus Labienus Fortunatus (Nova Roma)|T. Labienus Fortunatus]] *[[Flavius Galerius Aurelianus (Nova Roma)|F. Galerius Aurelianus]]9 KB (1,056 words) - 02:56, 11 December 2023
- junior= Titus Iulius Sabinus junior= Marcus Iulius Severus6 KB (752 words) - 11:16, 28 June 2024
- ...resignations from the Senate, specially the latest by consularis M. Iulius Severus ; 3. C. Flavius Diocletianus - Germania19 KB (2,883 words) - 15:37, 12 December 2015
- ** Suffectus: [[Oppius Flaccus Severus (Nova Roma)|Op. Flaccus Severus]] (elected {{May 23}}) *[[Titus Octavius Pius Ahenobarbus (Nova Roma)|T. Octavius Pius]]12 KB (1,530 words) - 02:50, 11 December 2023
- Consules: Marcus Moravius Piscinus Horatianus, Titus Iulius Sabinus Praetores: Marcus Curiatius Complutensis and Marcus Iulius Severus2 KB (263 words) - 08:54, 26 June 2024
- *15) GFD - Gaius Flavius Diocletianus (proxy vote cast by DIPI) *18) TIS - Titus Iulius Sabinus8 KB (1,327 words) - 08:24, 26 June 2024
- *[TIS] Titus Iulius Sabinus. *[MIS] Marcus Iulius Severus.24 KB (3,717 words) - 21:54, 7 February 2010
- ...tius Complutensis ]] and [[Marcus Iulius Severus (Nova Roma)|Marcus Iulius Severus]] for [[MMDCCLXII]] a.U.c}} {{CitizenImage|name=Marcus Iulius Severus}}<br/>M. Iulius Severus <br/>{{albumcivium|id=8632| text=Praetor MMDCCLXI}}</div>3 KB (408 words) - 09:06, 7 July 2024
- *Quaestor to LCC: [[Titus Flavius Aquila (Nova Roma)|Titus Flavius Aquila]] *Scriba - GIC: [[Decimus Aemilius Severus (Nova Roma)|Decimus Aemilius Severus]]10 KB (1,285 words) - 08:43, 7 July 2024
- M. Iulius Severus *Tiberius Cornelius Scipio is assigned to Consul M. Iulius Severus24 KB (3,758 words) - 18:57, 27 May 2009
- * [[Titus Iulius Sabinus (Nova Roma)|T. Iulius Sabinus]] Senior Scriba. Distributes a * Scriba [[Titus Flavius Aquila (Nova Roma)|T. Flavius Aquila]] processes applications in the German language12 KB (1,644 words) - 09:04, 7 July 2024
- :{{2009}} to consul [[Marcus Iulius Severus (Nova Roma)|M. Iulius Severus]] :{{2011}} to censor [[Titus Iulius Sabinus (Nova Roma)|Ti. Iulius Sabinus]]5 KB (656 words) - 15:26, 2 September 2012
- :Marcus Aelius Severus :Titus Annaeus Regulus880 B (115 words) - 06:34, 25 June 2024
- *[[Marcus Aelius Severus (Nova Roma)| M. Aelius Severus]] *[[Decimus Aemilius Severus (Nova Roma)|D. Aemilius Severus]]15 KB (2,107 words) - 09:06, 7 July 2024
- *4) TIS - Titus Iulius Sabinus *17) MIS - Marcus Iulius Severus37 KB (6,517 words) - 11:14, 11 October 2009
- *4) TIS - Titus Iulius Sabinus *17) MIS - Marcus Iulius Severus37 KB (6,396 words) - 08:24, 26 June 2024
- | style="text-align:center; font-size:8pt;" | Flavius Diocletianus C. | style="text-align:center; font-size:8pt;" | Iulius Severus I.49 KB (7,736 words) - 08:24, 26 June 2024
- *[[Caius Flavius Diocletianus (Nova Roma)|Caius Flavius Diocletianus]] *[[Titus Octavius Decula (Nova Roma)|Titus Octavius Decula]]11 KB (1,401 words) - 04:45, 6 July 2024