User contributions
From NovaRoma
(Latest | Earliest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)
- 17:00, 23 August 2015 (diff | hist) N Gaius Vipsanius Agrippa (Nova Roma) (moved Gaius Vipsanius Agrippa (Nova Roma) to Quintus Vipsanius Agrippa (Nova Roma): Citizen changed his praenomen) (top)
- 17:00, 23 August 2015 (diff | hist) m Quintus Vipsanius Agrippa (Nova Roma) (moved Gaius Vipsanius Agrippa (Nova Roma) to Quintus Vipsanius Agrippa (Nova Roma): Citizen changed his praenomen)
- 16:49, 23 August 2015 (diff | hist) m Senate Public Enterprise Committee (Nova Roma) (Praenomen change of member reflected)
- 16:47, 23 August 2015 (diff | hist) Quintus Vipsanius Agrippa (Nova Roma)
- 03:14, 30 July 2015 (diff | hist) m Senate Public Enterprise Committee (Nova Roma) (added missing senator)
- 02:52, 30 July 2015 (diff | hist) m Senate Public Enterprise Committee (Nova Roma) (Added missing senator)
- 15:47, 29 July 2015 (diff | hist) Senate Public Enterprise Committee (Nova Roma)
- 15:46, 29 July 2015 (diff | hist) m Senate Communications Committee (Nova Roma) (Added new member)
- 15:45, 29 July 2015 (diff | hist) m Senate Policy Committee (Nova Roma) (Added new member)
- 21:34, 28 July 2015 (diff | hist) m Senate Communications Committee (Nova Roma) (Added new member)
- 21:34, 28 July 2015 (diff | hist) m Senate Finance Committee (Nova Roma) (Added new member)
- 21:33, 28 July 2015 (diff | hist) m Senate Communications Committee (Nova Roma) (Added new member)
- 21:32, 28 July 2015 (diff | hist) m Senate Finance Committee (Nova Roma) (Added new member)
- 20:30, 28 July 2015 (diff | hist) m Senate Policy Committee (Nova Roma) (Added new member)
- 18:25, 28 July 2015 (diff | hist) m Senate Policy Committee (Nova Roma) (Added new member)
- 17:39, 27 July 2015 (diff | hist) m Factio Praesina (Nova Roma) (Updated Dominus factionis)
- 20:16, 26 July 2015 (diff | hist) m List of current governors (Updated governor of Canada Citerior)
- 17:19, 21 July 2015 (diff | hist) m Gnaeus Iulius Caesar (Nova Roma)
- 17:15, 21 July 2015 (diff | hist) m Gnaeus Iulius Caesar (Nova Roma)
- 21:18, 19 July 2015 (diff | hist) m Gnaeus Iulius Caesar (Nova Roma)
- 06:41, 5 July 2015 (diff | hist) m Gnaeus Iulius Caesar (Nova Roma)
- 05:04, 4 July 2015 (diff | hist) m Gnaeus Iulius Caesar (Nova Roma)
- 09:17, 2 January 2015 (diff | hist) m Gnaeus Iulius Caesar (Nova Roma) (Added proconsul appointment)
- 02:12, 2 January 2015 (diff | hist) m Magistrates MMDCCLXVIII
- 02:09, 2 January 2015 (diff | hist) m Magistrates MMDCCLXVIII (Corrected Quadratus' positioning in the table)
- 02:04, 2 January 2015 (diff | hist) N 2015 (Redirected page to MMDCCLXVIII) (top)
- 22:30, 1 January 2015 (diff | hist) List of current senators
- 22:24, 1 January 2015 (diff | hist) List of ius sententiae dicendae (Updates re new praetors)
- 22:14, 1 January 2015 (diff | hist) List of current senators (Updated senate rankings and positions held)
- 21:31, 1 January 2015 (diff | hist) m Senate (Nova Roma) (→Organization of the senatorial work)
- 21:29, 1 January 2015 (diff | hist) Senate (Nova Roma)
- 06:10, 31 December 2014 (diff | hist) Senate Public Enterprise Committee (Nova Roma)
- 06:09, 31 December 2014 (diff | hist) m Senate Communications Committee (Nova Roma) (removed ex-member)
- 06:08, 31 December 2014 (diff | hist) m Senate Civic Education Committee (Nova Roma) (removed ex member)
- 06:28, 29 December 2014 (diff | hist) Gnaeus Iulius Caesar (Nova Roma)
- 20:06, 17 December 2014 (diff | hist) m List of current senators (Province updates and add Caeca)
- 19:56, 17 December 2014 (diff | hist) m List of ius sententiae dicendae (Removed Crassus from this catergory)
- 19:54, 17 December 2014 (diff | hist) m List of current senators (Added Crassus)
- 19:49, 17 December 2014 (diff | hist) List of current senators
- 19:45, 17 December 2014 (diff | hist) m List of current senators (Removed Cassius re non-payment of tax)
- 20:12, 14 December 2014 (diff | hist) m Gnaeus Iulius Caesar (Nova Roma) (Updatyed dates of appointments)
- 06:01, 13 December 2014 (diff | hist) m Gnaeus Iulius Caesar (Nova Roma) (Added a.u.c. abbrv and detail re cursus)
- 18:45, 11 December 2014 (diff | hist) List of current senators (Removed resigned senator)
- 02:22, 11 December 2014 (diff | hist) Gnaeus Iulius Caesar (Nova Roma) (added pontifical secretary position)
- 06:12, 28 November 2014 (diff | hist) Gnaeus Iulius Caesar (Nova Roma)
- 06:05, 28 November 2014 (diff | hist) Gnaeus Iulius Caesar (Nova Roma)
- 19:31, 26 November 2014 (diff | hist) Senate Policy Committee (Nova Roma)
- 19:30, 26 November 2014 (diff | hist) Senate Finance Committee (Nova Roma) (Removed TGP)
- 19:29, 26 November 2014 (diff | hist) Senate Civic Education Committee (Nova Roma) (removed TGP)
- 19:29, 26 November 2014 (diff | hist) List of current senators (Removed TGP)
(Latest | Earliest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)