User contributions
From NovaRoma
(Latest | Earliest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)
- 03:28, 20 November 2015 (diff | hist) m Template:2015 (Added Laenas)
- 03:25, 20 November 2015 (diff | hist) m Magistrates MMDCCLXVIII (Added dictatorial appointments)
- 07:57, 19 November 2015 (diff | hist) m Magistrates MMDCCLXVIII (Updated tribunician removals)
- 00:56, 18 November 2015 (diff | hist) Gnaeus Iulius Caesar (Nova Roma)
- 00:55, 18 November 2015 (diff | hist) m Gnaeus Iulius Caesar (Nova Roma)
- 00:53, 18 November 2015 (diff | hist) m Template:2015 (edited to reflect removal of consul)
- 00:48, 18 November 2015 (diff | hist) Dictator (Nova Roma)
- 00:42, 18 November 2015 (diff | hist) N Magister Equitum (Nova Roma) (Created page with "Held by Lucius Cornelius Sulla Felix")
- 00:40, 18 November 2015 (diff | hist) Magistrates MMDCCLXVIII
- 00:36, 18 November 2015 (diff | hist) m Magistrates MMDCCLXVIII
- 00:35, 18 November 2015 (diff | hist) m Magistrates MMDCCLXVIII (Removals by dictatorial edict updated)
- 00:23, 18 November 2015 (diff | hist) m List of ius sententiae dicendae (Deletions reflecting dictatorial removals)
- 00:21, 18 November 2015 (diff | hist) m List of current senators (Changes made to reflect Dictatorial removals and resignations)
- 19:57, 13 November 2015 (diff | hist) m Senate Communications Committee (Nova Roma) (Added Scholastica)
- 05:24, 7 November 2015 (diff | hist) m Election MMDCCLXVIII/Gnaeus Iulius Caesar (spelling error)
- 05:20, 7 November 2015 (diff | hist) m Gnaeus Iulius Caesar (Nova Roma) (Added 2768 AUC election statement)
- 05:15, 7 November 2015 (diff | hist) N Election MMDCCLXVIII/Gnaeus Iulius Caesar (Created page with "Cn. Iulius Caesar et Lucius Cornelius Sulla Felix omnibus sal. We both would like to announce that we are standing for the office of consul in the forthcoming elections, and we ...")
- 22:20, 6 November 2015 (diff | hist) m Gnaeus Iulius Caesar (Nova Roma) (deleted defunct links)
- 14:50, 5 November 2015 (diff | hist) File:Mos maiorum.pdf (uploaded a new version of "File:Mos maiorum.pdf") (top)
- 12:30, 5 November 2015 (diff | hist) m Gnaeus Iulius Caesar (Nova Roma) (Added details of new publication)
- 12:25, 5 November 2015 (diff | hist) N File:Mos maiorum.pdf
- 19:11, 4 November 2015 (diff | hist) m Statia Cornelia Valeriana Iuliana Aeternia (Nova Roma) (Amended photo name) (top)
- 13:44, 4 November 2015 (diff | hist) m Magistrates MMDCCLXVIII (Updated Caeca's position as praetor)
- 00:43, 2 November 2015 (diff | hist) m List of ius sententiae dicendae (Renumbered to reflect chages due to Auden's resignation from the Senate)
- 00:41, 2 November 2015 (diff | hist) m List of current senators (Reflecting resignation of Audens from the Senate)
- 08:48, 19 September 2015 (diff | hist) m Provincia (Nova Roma)
- 07:43, 19 September 2015 (diff | hist) m Provincia (Nova Roma) (Title edit)
- 21:25, 18 September 2015 (diff | hist) m Provincia (Nova Roma) (Added provincial link)
- 21:10, 18 September 2015 (diff | hist) m List of current senators (Corrected Cacea's ranking)
- 20:51, 18 September 2015 (diff | hist) m Provincia (Nova Roma) (Added provincial links)
- 20:43, 18 September 2015 (diff | hist) m Provincia (Nova Roma) (Added provincial links)
- 20:37, 18 September 2015 (diff | hist) m Provincia (Nova Roma) (Provincial links added)
- 04:48, 12 September 2015 (diff | hist) File:NovaRomaOnward.pdf (uploaded a new version of "File:NovaRomaOnward.pdf": A discussion paper by Gnaeus Iulius Caesar and Lucius Cornelius Sulla Felix.)
- 04:22, 12 September 2015 (diff | hist) m Gnaeus Iulius Caesar (Nova Roma) (Added details of Nova Roma Onward)
- 04:03, 12 September 2015 (diff | hist) N File:NovaRomaOnward.pdf (A discussion paper by Gnaeus Iulius Caesar and Lucius Cornelius Sulla Felix)
- 04:01, 12 September 2015 (diff | hist) m Gnaeus Iulius Caesar (Nova Roma) (updated link to NRR)
- 03:57, 12 September 2015 (diff | hist) N File:NovaRomaReborn.pdf (A discussion paper by Gnaeus Iulius Caesar) (top)
- 20:23, 8 September 2015 (diff | hist) m Senate Finance Committee (Nova Roma) (Added Laenas)
- 20:00, 8 September 2015 (diff | hist) m Provincia (Nova Roma)
- 17:21, 8 September 2015 (diff | hist) m List of ius sententiae dicendae (Added Laenas)
- 09:18, 6 September 2015 (diff | hist) m Senate Civic Education Committee (Nova Roma) (Added new member and details of new chair)
- 22:16, 5 September 2015 (diff | hist) m List of ius sententiae dicendae
- 22:15, 5 September 2015 (diff | hist) m List of current senators
- 22:13, 5 September 2015 (diff | hist) m List of current senators
- 22:12, 5 September 2015 (diff | hist) m List of current senators (Updated Fabius' province)
- 21:36, 5 September 2015 (diff | hist) List of ius sententiae dicendae
- 21:34, 5 September 2015 (diff | hist) List of ius sententiae dicendae (Added Scholastica due to her apology tot he Senate and removal of nota)
- 07:24, 5 September 2015 (diff | hist) m List of ius sententiae dicendae (Updated Tutor to reflect he is consul)
- 18:06, 3 September 2015 (diff | hist) m Provincia Canada Ulterior - Praetorium (Nova Roma) (title change)
- 10:20, 3 September 2015 (diff | hist) m Gnaeus Iulius Caesar (Nova Roma)
(Latest | Earliest) View (newer 50 | older 50) (20 | 50 | 100 | 250 | 500)